MO HB1307 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the minimum waiting period before a woman can have an abortion from 24 hours to 72 hours
Title
Changes the minimum waiting period before a woman can have an abortion from 24 hours to 72 hours
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-09-10 | Senate | Passed over Veto (G) |
2014-09-10 | Senate | Taken Up |
2014-09-10 | House | Reported to The Senate (S) |
2014-09-10 | House | Passed over Veto (G) - AYES: 117 NOES: 44 |
2014-09-10 | House | Taken Up |
2014-07-02 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-02 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-15 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-14 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 111 NOES: 39 |
2014-05-14 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 111 NOES: 40 |
2014-05-14 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 22 NOES: 9 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) - SA 2 DEFEATED/POINT OF ORDER WITHDRAWN |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 2/POINT OF ORDER TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT/SCS |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-28 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 14, 2014, Upon evening recess or adjournment, Senate Lounge |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 39 |
2014-03-05 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1 adopted AYES: 115 NOES: 37 |
2014-03-05 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-05 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred: Health Care Policy(H) |
2014-01-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |