MO HB1308 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that certain irrevocable standby letters of credit possess the highest rating issued by specified nationally recognized agencies to be acceptable collateral for public deposits
Title
Repeals the requirement that certain irrevocable standby letters of credit possess the highest rating issued by specified nationally recognized agencies to be acceptable collateral for public deposits
Sponsors
Rep. Don Wells [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-12 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-02 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 00 | |
2012-04-26 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-03-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, MARCH 26, 2012, 2:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-02-23 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-02-23 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 3 | |
2012-02-22 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-02-22 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Laid Over (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred: Financial Institutions (H) | |
2012-01-17 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |