MO HB1316 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the collection of property taxes and the assessment of property
Title
Changes the laws regarding the collection of property taxes and the assessment of property
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Deeken [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-08 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 130 NOES: 16 | |
2010-05-13 | House Concurs (H) - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 140 NOES: 10 | |
2010-05-11 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS AS AMENDED | |
2010-05-11 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6 ADOPTED YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-11 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2010-05-11 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-10 | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 ADOPTED/SCS, SA 2 PENDING | |
2010-05-10 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-06 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-05-06 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-05-06 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-05-05 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 6, 2010, 8:00A.M.,SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 | |
2010-05-04 | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S) | |
2010-05-03 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-05-03 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2010-04-28 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-27 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 28, 2010, 12:00P.M.SENATE LOUNGE | |
2010-04-26 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2010-04-22 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-22 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-04-21 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-21 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-21 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-04-20 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2010-04-19 | Perfected (H) | |
2010-04-19 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-04-12 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-12 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-12 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-25 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-17 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred: Tax Reform (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-03 | Prefiled (H) |