MO HB1330 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the conveyance of certain state property.
Title
Authorizes the conveyance of certain state property.
Sponsors
Rep. Rudy Veit [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - House - House: HB 1330 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: HB 1330 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: HB 1330 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: HB 1330 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: HB 1330 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: HB 1330 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: HB 1330 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2020-07-14 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2020-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2020-05-14 | House | House Message (H) |
2020-05-14 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 121 NOES: 23 PRESENT: 1 |
2020-05-14 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-14 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS as amended AYES: 143 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-14 | House | Taken Up |
2020-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-05-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-05-07 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 27 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 AYES: 29 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-06 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2020-05-06 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 12:00 pm, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Room 117 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-02-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-11 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |