MO HB1335 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the selling of raw milk or cream.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the selling of raw milk or cream.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2020-03-11 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-03-11 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-03-11 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-11 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 27 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |