MO HB1367 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows licensees to obtain duplicate licenses from the board of cosmetology and barber examiners
Title
Allows licensees to obtain duplicate licenses from the board of cosmetology and barber examiners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House: HB 1367 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 5, 2018, 2:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Professional Registration(S) |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-07 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-07 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |