MO HB138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes "Simon's Law," which changes the laws regarding life-sustaining or nonbeneficial treatment policies of health care facilities.
Title
Establishes "Simon's Law," which changes the laws regarding life-sustaining or nonbeneficial treatment policies of health care facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Kidd [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - House - House: HB 138 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: HB 138 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: HB 138 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: HB 138 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: HB 138 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2019-07-11 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2019-05-13 | House | House Message (H) |
2019-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 146 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 3, 2019, 10:30am or upon morning recess, SCR 1 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Health and Pensions (S) |
2019-02-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-20 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-20 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |