MO HB1383 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Three holiday designations for health awareness.
Title
Three holiday designations for health awareness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 1383 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - 12:00 pm, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Room 117 |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 10:30 a.m. or upon recess, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Senate Chamber |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Health and Pensions(S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1 |
2020-03-09 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 adopted |
2020-03-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |