MO HB1386 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to lobbyists.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to lobbyists.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 1386 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | SCS Defeated (S) |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics(S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1 |
2020-03-09 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |