MO HB1387 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Authorized Electronic Monitoring in Long-Term Care Facilities Act."
Title
Establishes the "Authorized Electronic Monitoring in Long-Term Care Facilities Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: HB 1387 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 147 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 8:00 a.m., Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Senate Chamber |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children(S) |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-02-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-18 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Aging(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |