MO HB1414 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-26 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-26 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that any elected or appointed official of the state or a political subdivision who is found guilty of or pleads guilty to a felony must immediately forfeit all of his or her benefits
Title
Specifies that any elected or appointed official of the state or a political subdivision who is found guilty of or pleads guilty to a felony must immediately forfeit all of his or her benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McGhee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2010-01-14 | Referred: Spec Stand Com on Gov. Account. & Ethics Reform | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-17 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1414&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1414I.htm |