MO HB1437 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Adds provisions relating to the abandonment of newborn children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds provisions relating to the abandonment of newborn children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-03-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-03-04HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-03-04HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-03HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-03-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-18HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-02-13HouseReferred: Children and Families(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-02HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback