MO HB1455 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Downsizing State Government(H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Downsizing State Government(H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevents the state government from sharing medical marijuana user or applicant information with the federal government and others.
Title
Prevents the state government from sharing medical marijuana user or applicant information with the federal government and others.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1455&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3704H.01I.pdf |