MO HB1460 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration date of the Statewide Court Automation Fund from September 1, 2013, to September 1, 2018, and the Court Automation Committee from September 1, 2015, to September 1, 2020
Title
Extends the expiration date of the Statewide Court Automation Fund from September 1, 2013, to September 1, 2018, and the Court Automation Committee from September 1, 2015, to September 1, 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Caleb Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-12 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-16 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 0 | |
2012-05-16 | House Concurs (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 143 NOES: 0 | |
2012-05-03 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS | |
2012-05-03 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 00 | |
2012-05-03 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2012-05-01 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-04-11 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-10 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 11, UPON EVENING ADJOURNMENT, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred: Judiciary (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |