MO HB1460 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a tax deduction for any prize or award won by an Olympic medalist
Title
Authorizes a tax deduction for any prize or award won by an Olympic medalist
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Evans [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1460 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 107 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1460 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 86 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1460 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 88 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: HB 1460 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1460 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 86 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1460 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 88 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: HB 1460 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-30 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (H) |
2018-05-18 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 88 NOES: 60 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS#2 AYES: 86 NOES: 62 PRESENT: 2 |
2018-05-18 | House | Taken Up |
2018-05-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-05-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-05-17 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 24 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SS and SA 1 pending |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 6, 2018, 9:00am, SCR 1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-13 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 2 adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-13 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |