MO HB149 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the expiration and termination dates for the provisions which allow an individual or corporation to designate part of a tax refund to the Missouri Military Family Relief Fund
Title
Removes the expiration and termination dates for the provisions which allow an individual or corporation to designate part of a tax refund to the Missouri Military Family Relief Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-14 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-14 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-10 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-04-27 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-04-27 | Third Read and Passed (S) | |
2011-04-27 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2011-04-21 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2011-03-16 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-15 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-01-25 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-01-25 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-25 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Veterans (H) | |
2011-01-12 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |