MO HB1493 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts to recognize certain graduate and undergraduate hours as equivalent to a master's degree on the salary schedule
Title
Requires school districts to recognize certain graduate and undergraduate hours as equivalent to a master's degree on the salary schedule
Sponsors
Rep. David Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1493&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4976H.01I.pdf |