MO HB150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes law enforcement procedures relating to racial profiling, searches and seizures, and traffic stops.
Title
Establishes law enforcement procedures relating to racial profiling, searches and seizures, and traffic stops.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB150&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0462H.01I.pdf |