MO HB151 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an individual or corporation to designate all or a portion of his or her income tax refund to the Organ Donor Program or to send a separate check with the payment of his or her taxes
Title
Authorizes an individual or corporation to designate all or a portion of his or her income tax refund to the Organ Donor Program or to send a separate check with the payment of his or her taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-11 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-11 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-11 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-11 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-11 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-05-11 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-05-10 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-05-09 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2011-05-05 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-28 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-21 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means (S) | |
2011-03-16 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-15 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2011-01-12 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |