MO HB1563 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding healthcare services
Title
Changes the laws regarding healthcare services
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-12 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-16 | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 131 NOES: 11 | |
2012-05-16 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 0 | |
2012-05-16 | House Concurs (H) - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 145 NOES: 0 | |
2012-05-14 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS AS AMENDED | |
2012-05-14 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0 | |
2012-05-14 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2012-05-14 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2012-05-14 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-14 | Placed on Informal Calendar - SS & SA 1 PENDING | |
2012-05-14 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2012-05-14 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-09 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-03 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-02 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-24 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-18 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 24, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-08 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-03-07 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H) | |
2012-01-31 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |