MO HB1563 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes guidelines a person must follow to purchase a firearm in the state of Missouri and provides that certain entities selling firearms, ammunition, or accessories, or those who train individuals in firearm use, are ineligible to receive state funds or tax credits
Title
Establishes guidelines a person must follow to purchase a firearm in the state of Missouri and provides that certain entities selling firearms, ammunition, or accessories, or those who train individuals in firearm use, are ineligible to receive state funds or tax credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1563&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4416H.01I.pdf |