MO HB1608 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that legislative research will compare the actual fiscal note of all bills Truly Agreed and Finally Passed by the General Assembly with the final fiscal note provided prior to passage
Title
Specifies that legislative research will compare the actual fiscal note of all bills Truly Agreed and Finally Passed by the General Assembly with the final fiscal note provided prior to passage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House: HB 1608 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 7, 2018, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Government Reform(S) |
2018-02-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-14 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |