MO HB1612 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding common sewer districts
Title
Changes the laws regarding common sewer districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-07 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-11 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 2 | |
2010-05-11 | House Concurs (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 151 NOES: 2 | |
2010-04-27 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS | |
2010-04-27 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-04-27 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2010-04-22 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-20 | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) | |
2010-04-20 | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-15 | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2010-03-18 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-17 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-17 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-15 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent | |
2010-02-25 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2010-01-14 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |