MO HB166 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding unlawful actions by persons knowingly infected with communicable diseases.
Title
Changes the laws regarding unlawful actions by persons knowingly infected with communicable diseases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB166&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0250H.01I.pdf |