MO HB1660 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to career and technical education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to career and technical education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: HB 1660 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 1, 2018, 1:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 24, 2018, 1:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-14 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-09 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-01-09 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |