MO HB168 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Second read and referred: Health and Pensions (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts health care entities registered with the Department of Health and Senior Services that distribute hypodermic needles or syringes from the crime of unlawful delivery of drug paraphernalia

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts health care entities registered with the Department of Health and Senior Services that distribute hypodermic needles or syringes from the crime of unlawful delivery of drug paraphernalia

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 168 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 124 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateSecond read and referred: Health and Pensions (S)
2019-04-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-04-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 124 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-08HouseTaken Up
2019-04-02HousePerfected (H)
2019-04-02HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-04-02HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-04-02HouseTaken Up
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-03-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-26HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-14HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-03-14HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-13HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-02-13HouseReferred: Special Committee on Urban Issues(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-03HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback