MO HB1685 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows physicians to prescribe certain investigational drugs, biological products, or devices to certain eligible terminally ill patients
Title
Allows physicians to prescribe certain investigational drugs, biological products, or devices to certain eligible terminally ill patients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-14 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-14 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-16 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 26 |
2014-05-16 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 26 |
2014-05-16 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2014-05-16 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-16 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 |
2014-05-16 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 142 |
2014-05-16 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-05-15 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2014-05-15 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-15 | House | Conferees Re-appointed (S) - Senators: SCHAAF, WASSON, SATER, LEVOTA, HOLSMAN |
2014-05-15 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-15 | House | Conferees Re-appointed (H) - Representatives: NEELY, RICHARDSON, MITTEN |
2014-05-15 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-15 | House | Senate Grants Conference (S) |
2014-05-15 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-15 | House | House Requests a Further Conference (H) |
2014-05-15 | House | House Refuses to Adopt (C) |
2014-05-15 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-14 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2014-05-14 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-14 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS SCHAAF, WASSON, SATER, LEVOTA, HOLSMAN |
2014-05-14 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-14 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES NEELY, RICHARDSON, MITTEN |
2014-05-14 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-14 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2014-05-14 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-13 | House | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2014-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 1-0, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S) |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 |
2014-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 1 |
2014-03-26 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2014-02-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |