MO HB17 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To appropriate money for capital improvement and other purposes for the several departments of state government
Title
To appropriate money for capital improvement and other purposes for the several departments of state government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 17 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 144 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 17 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 145 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: HB 17 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 17 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 145 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: HB 17 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-06-30 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-08 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-04 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-04 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-03 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2017-05-03 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-01 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES FITZPATRICK, ALFERMAN, BAHR, KENDRICK, BUTLER |
2017-05-01 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-01 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - BROWN, SATER, CUNNINGHAM, CURLS, NASHEED |
2017-05-01 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2017-05-01 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-04-27 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SCS as amended |
2017-04-27 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 2 AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-26 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-12 | House | Perfected (H) |
2017-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-04-12 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 27 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |