MO HB1711 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain shelf stable packaged foods to be donated to and distributed by charitable organizations.
Title
Allows certain shelf stable packaged foods to be donated to and distributed by charitable organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Remole [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 1711 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 1711 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 2:00 p.m., Monday, April 27, 2020, Joint Committee Room |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |