MO HB172 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the third week of September as "Historically Black College and University Week" in Missouri.
Title
Designates the third week of September as "Historically Black College and University Week" in Missouri.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB172&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0425H.01I.pdf |