MO HB1744 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-07 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-07 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of revenue to accept electronic versions of documents used to verify the residency of applicants for Missouri driver's licenses.
Title
Requires the department of revenue to accept electronic versions of documents used to verify the residency of applicants for Missouri driver's licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House: HB 1744 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-12 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |