MO HB1752 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to working animals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to working animals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House: HB 1752 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-03-12HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-12HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-03-10HousePerfected (H)
2020-03-10HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2020-03-10HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-03-10HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-03-10HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2020-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-10HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-03HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-02-03HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-29HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-22HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: Agriculture Policy(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-12HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback