MO HB1791 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Higher Education(H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Higher Education(H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri DREAM Trust Fund and the Missouri Dream Trust Fund Commission
Title
Establishes the Missouri DREAM Trust Fund and the Missouri Dream Trust Fund Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-27 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1791&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5570H.01I.pdf |