MO HB18 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To appropriate money for purposes for the several departments and offices of state government; for projects involving the maintenance, repair, replacement, and improvement of state buildings and facilities
Title
To appropriate money for purposes for the several departments and offices of state government; for projects involving the maintenance, repair, replacement, and improvement of state buildings and facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 18 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 147 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 18 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 146 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: HB 18 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 18 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 146 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: HB 18 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-06-30 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-04 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-04 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 147 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 AYES: 30 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-26 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 26, 2017, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 adopted |
2017-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-04-12 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 28 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |