MO HB1817 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes certain administrative penalties from the calculation of local effort in Iron County.
Title
Excludes certain administrative penalties from the calculation of local effort in Iron County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 1817 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 12:00 pm, Tuesday, April 28, 2020, Joint Committee Room |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |