MO HB1843 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Commissioner of Administration to procure a blanket bond or crime insurance policy to protect the state against loss from the acts or omissions of any state-compensated person within the judiciary.
Title
Requires the Commissioner of Administration to procure a blanket bond or crime insurance policy to protect the state against loss from the acts or omissions of any state-compensated person within the judiciary.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1843&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4222H.01I.pdf |