MO HB1862 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to landlord-tenant law
Title
Modifies provisions relating to landlord-tenant law
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Cross [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - House - House: HB 1862 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 128 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: HB 1862 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 128 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: HB 1862 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 126 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: HB 1862 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: HB 1862 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 128 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: HB 1862 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 126 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: HB 1862 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-07-14 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-12 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 128 NOES: 24 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-12 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 128 NOES: 25 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-12 | House | Taken Up |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2016-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-06 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 AYES: 27 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - with SS, SCS pending |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-28 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 5, 2016, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge Amended |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 25 PRESENT: 1 |
2016-02-11 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Taken Up |
2016-01-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2016-01-21 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-20 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-15 | House | Prefiled (H) |