MO HB1887 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a property owners' association from preventing a property owner from placing political signs on his or her property
Title
Prohibits a property owners' association from preventing a property owner from placing political signs on his or her property
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Bahr [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: HB 1887 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: HB 1887 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 12:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2018-02-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-20 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-20 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |