MO HB196 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding unemployment benefits, requires the Department of Economic Development to establish the Missouri Works Training Program, and establishes the Missouri Works Job Training Joint Legislative Oversight Committee
Title
Changes the laws regarding unemployment benefits, requires the Department of Economic Development to establish the Missouri Works Training Program, and establishes the Missouri Works Job Training Joint Legislative Oversight Committee
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanie Lauer [R] | Rep. Anne Zerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-11 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-17 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 129 NOES: 22 |
2013-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 17 |
2013-05-17 | House | House Concurs (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 139 NOES: 15 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 32 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS/SA 1/ AND POINT OF ORDER PENDING |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 17, 2013, 12:00PM OR UPON MORNING RECESS, SENATE LOUNGE |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 13 |
2013-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2013-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |