MO HB1987 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the statute of limitations for certain actions regarding child abuse and sexual offenses committed against a child
Title
Changes the statute of limitations for certain actions regarding child abuse and sexual offenses committed against a child
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-13 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Re-referred to Committee: Judiciary(H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2018-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |