MO HB2006 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-27 - Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-27 - Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Agriculture, Department of Natural Resources, and Department of Conservation
Title
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Agriculture, Department of Natural Resources, and Department of Conservation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - House: HB 2006 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: HB 2006 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 122 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: HB 2006 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: HB 2006 (*HA 8) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 67 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - House - House: HB 2006 (*HA 10) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 112 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: HB 2006 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 122 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: HB 2006 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: HB 2006 (*HA 8) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 67 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - House - House: HB 2006 (*HA 10) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 112 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-27 | House | Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27 |
2016-05-09 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-05-06 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-04-21 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2016-04-21 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-21 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-21 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2016-04-21 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-21 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 122 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-21 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-21 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-04-20 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2016-04-20 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Conferee Removed - Rone replacing Flanigan |
2016-04-12 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-04-12 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES FLANIGAN, FITZPATRICK, REDMON, MCCANN BEATTY, KENDRICK |
2016-04-12 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2016-04-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SCHAEFER, SILVEY, BROWN, CURLS, WALSH |
2016-04-12 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2016-04-12 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-04-12 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2016-04-12 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-06 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Wednesday, April 6, 2016, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 6, 2016, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 5, 2016, upon morning recess, Senate Committee Room 2, amended |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 4, 2016, thirty minutes upon adjournment. Senate Committee Room 2 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Friday, April 1, 2016, |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Friday, April 1, 2016, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 29, 2016, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 30, 2016, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 31, 2016, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 118 NOES: 32 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-10 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-08 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 9, HA 10, HA 11 and HA 12 adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-08 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-08 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 12 |
2016-03-08 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-08 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2016-03-08 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-08 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 10, HA 11 |
2016-03-08 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-08 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 9, |
2016-03-08 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-08 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 2 adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-08 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-07 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2016-03-07 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-07 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit (H) - Do Pass with a time limit of six hours of debate on Perfection pursuant to Rule 27(11)(d)4 |
2016-03-07 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit (H) |
2016-03-07 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2016-03-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 26 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Budget(H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1, HCA 2, HCA 3, HCA 4 AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Appropriations - Agriculture, Conservation, and Natural Resources(H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |