MO HB2008 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Public Safety
Title
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Public Safety
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Stream [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-09-10 | Senate | Passed over Veto (G) - Senate concurred in line item vetoes to CCS SCS HCS HB 2008 |
2014-09-10 | Senate | Taken Up |
2014-09-10 | House | Reported to The Senate (S) |
2014-09-10 | House | Passed over Veto (G) - Section 8.050 for reimbursing SAFE-Care providers for performing forensic medical exams on children suspected of having been physically abused; Section 8.010 for the purpose of funding two (2) non-profit pilot alternative schools; Section 8.025 for the purpose of purchasing a secure web-based software and content service to provide emergency preparedness plans for all Missouri schools;Section 8.110 for the Independence Crime Lab;Section 8.085 for fringe benefits for the Independence Crime Lab; Section 8.095 for the Water Patrol Division for defibrillators for boats. |
2014-09-10 | House | Taken Up |
2014-06-24 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-24 | House | Vetoed in Part by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-08 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 1 |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 1 |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2014-05-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-08 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 6 |
2014-05-08 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 5 |
2014-05-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-05-07 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2014-05-05 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-01 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES STREAM, FLANIGAN, HAEFNER, RIZZO, KELLY(45) |
2014-05-01 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-01 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS SCHAEFER, SILVEY, BROWN, CURLS, WALSH |
2014-05-01 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2014-05-01 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-04-30 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SCS as amended |
2014-04-30 | House | Taken Up |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - sa 1, sa 1 to sa 2, sa 2 as amended, sa 3 adopted AYES: 31 NOES: 1 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 23, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, April 22, 2014, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Tuesday, April 15, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Thursday, April 17, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, April 15, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Appropriations Hearing Canceled for Thursday, April 10, and Friday, April 11, 2014. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 9, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2; Thursday, April 10, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2; Friday, April 10, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2. Mark-up. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 7, 2014, 1:00pm, Senate Committee Room 2; Tuesday, April 8, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2014-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 3 |
2014-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1 adopted |
2014-03-25 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Laid Over (H) - ha 1 adopted |
2014-03-25 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit (H) - six hours of total debate on Perfection |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |