MO HB2013 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates money for real property leases and related services
Title
Appropriates money for real property leases and related services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House: HB 2013 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: HB 2013 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: HB 2013 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: HB 2013 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: HB 2013 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-29 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-09 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-05-09 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 144 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Conference Committee Dissolved |
2018-05-09 | House | Taken Up |
2018-05-01 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2018-04-30 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS BROWN, HEGEMAN, SATER, CURLS, HOLSMAN |
2018-04-30 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES FITZPATRICK, ALFERMAN, BAHR, KENDRICK, RAZER |
2018-04-30 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2018-04-26 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2018-04-26 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-04-26 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2018-04-26 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-04-23 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 19, 2018, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 18, 2018, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 12, 2018, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 11, 2018, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 10, 2018, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-29 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-29 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-27 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-03-27 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-03-27 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-27 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2018-03-27 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-26 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-26 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-03-26 | House | SEE COMMENTS - Six (6) hours total debate on perfection pursuant to HR 6009 |
2018-03-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |