MO HB2013 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS BILL
Title
APPROPRIATIONS BILL
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2013 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2013 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 145 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House: HB 2013 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2013 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 145 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House: HB 2013 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2020-06-30 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2020-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2020-05-08 | House | House Message (H) |
2020-05-08 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-08 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 143 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-08 | House | Conference Committee Dissolved |
2020-05-08 | House | Taken Up |
2020-05-07 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2020-05-06 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2020-05-06 | House | House Message (H) |
2020-05-06 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2020-05-06 | House | Taken Up |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 29 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-05 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-05-04 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-01 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Appropriations pending referral - Saturday, May 2, 2020, 9:30 AM, Senate Chamber |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Appropriations pending referral - Friday, May 1, 2020, 9:30 AM, Senate Chamber |
2020-04-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-04-29 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-04-29 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-04-27 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-04-27 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-04-27 | House | Taken Up |
2020-04-27 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2020-04-27 | House | Taken Up |
2020-04-27 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2020-04-27 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-04-27 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-03-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - Six hours total debate on perfection. AYES: 35 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |