MO HB2015 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS BILL
Title
APPROPRIATIONS BILL
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2015 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2015 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: HB 2015 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2015 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2015 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: HB 2015 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2020-05-12 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2020-05-12 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-12 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2020-05-12 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2020-05-08 | House | House Message (H) |
2020-05-08 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-08 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS SCS AYES: 148 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-08 | House | Taken Up |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS SCS |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - SS SCS AYES: 30 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-08 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-05-07 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2020-05-05 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-05-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-05 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-05-05 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-05-05 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-05-05 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 27 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-05-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-05-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-05-01 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2020-05-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-04-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |