MO HB2018 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To appropriate money for purposes for the several departments and offices of state government; for projects involving the maintenance, repair, replacement, and improvement of state buildings and facilities
Title
To appropriate money for purposes for the several departments and offices of state government; for projects involving the maintenance, repair, replacement, and improvement of state buildings and facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: HB 2018 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: HB 2018 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 30 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 2, 2018, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-24 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-19 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 |
2018-04-19 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-04-19 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-04-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 26 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2018-02-19 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |