MO HB2033 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Small Business Regulatory Fairness Board and authorizes a tax credit for certain small businesses
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Small Business Regulatory Fairness Board and authorizes a tax credit for certain small businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2033&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2033I.PDF |