MO HB2089 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tort actions, specifically unlawful merchandising practices, products liability claims, and venue requirements
Title
Modifies provisions relating to tort actions, specifically unlawful merchandising practices, products liability claims, and venue requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-03-26 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2089&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5654H.02I.pdf |