MO HB2120 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to utility infrastructure
Title
Establishes provisions relating to utility infrastructure
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Kidd [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: HB 2120 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 108 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: HB 2120 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 109 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 2120 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: HB 2120 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: HB 2120 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 109 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 2120 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: HB 2120 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2020-05-15 | Senate | House Message (H) |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 108 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 3 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | House Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 109 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 2 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SSA 1 for SA 2, SA 3 AYES: 25 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Taken Up |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) - SA 1, SSA 1 for SA2, SA 3 |
2020-05-11 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2020-05-05 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 12:00 pm, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Senate Chamber |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |