MO HB2121 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the selection of Department of Revenue fee offices.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the selection of Department of Revenue fee offices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |